+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On October 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 2683.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 46. Noes 30. Page 2969.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 27).
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 30).
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1291.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1152.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 4.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 595.) (April 14).
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2015: Unfinished Business SB347 Jackson Concurrence
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 2
September 8, 2015: SB 347 Jackson Senate Third Reading By EGGMAN
- Yeas: 46
- Nays: 30
- Present/NV: 4
August 27, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB347 Jackson
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 15
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 14, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor