+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (23)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 16 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On August 8, 2018 in the Assembly:
- August 8 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 7, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On July 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- July 11 set for first hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 5. Noes 3.) Reconsideration granted.
On July 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 26, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- June 21 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On April 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 764.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 444.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
July 11, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 5
July 11, 2017: Reconsideration.
- Yeas: 13
April 20, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB346 Glazer et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 40
March 22, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor