+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 27 hearing postponed by committee.
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- July 15 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 8, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 1.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on HIGHER ED. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On June 23, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on TRANS. and HIGHER ED.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 1325.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1152.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 4.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 27 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 620.) (April 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on T. & H.
On February 25, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 27.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (9)
July 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
July 7, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education]
- Yeas: 16
June 29, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Higher Education]
- Yeas: 16
June 4, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB344 Monning
- Yeas: 38
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 4, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
April 14, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor