+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (43)
On September 13, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 297, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On August 29, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 5224.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 17, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 4884.)
On August 16, 2022 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4835.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On August 15, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 5884.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 4, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (August 3).
On June 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 13, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R.
On June 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on A. & A.R. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On May 26, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On May 5, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On January 24, 2022 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 24, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 2801.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 10, 2022 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 6, 2022 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- From inactive file on motion of Senator Hertzberg.
On May 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Umberg.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1180.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
- April 22 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 604.) (March 24).
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 24.
On March 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and GOV. & F.
On February 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On January 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On December 8, 2020 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 7.
On December 7, 2020 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (9)
August 29, 2022: Unfinished Business SB34 Umberg et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
August 17, 2022: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 5
August 15, 2022: SB 34 Umberg Senate Third Reading By Daly
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 6
August 3, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 2
June 29, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
January 24, 2022: Senate 3rd Reading SB34 Umberg Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 6
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 24, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1