+ − Full Texts (10)
+ − Actions (40)
On February 27, 2014 in the Senate:
- Consideration of Governor's veto stricken from file.
On October 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Vetoed by the Governor.
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
On September 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:30 p.m.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 35. Noes 2. Page 2433.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 2454.)
- Set for hearing September 12.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 3184.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2361.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2953.)
On September 4, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 13. Noes 1.) (August 30).
On August 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 13, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 12). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
- Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
On July 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 1683.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On July 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1636.) (July 1).
On June 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 1425.) (June 18).
On June 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On June 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing June 18.
On May 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
- Withdrawn from committee.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On April 25, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 23.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 12, 2013: From committee: That the Assembly Amendments be concurred in.
- Yeas: 11
September 12, 2013: Unfinished Supp 2 SB338 Hill Concurrence
- Yeas: 35
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 2
September 11, 2013: SB 338 Hill Senate Third Reading By MULLIN
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
August 12, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 1
July 8, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB338 Hill Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 32
- Present/NV: 6
July 1, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
June 18, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2