+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 298, Statutes of 2021.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2547.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 61. Noes 14. Page 2883.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (July 13).
On June 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 12. Noes 1.) (June 24).
On May 28, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on INS. and PUB. S.
On May 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1236.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to second reading.
On May 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 10.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 2. Page 859.) (April 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 20.
On April 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 13 hearing postponed by committee.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 634.) (March 25). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 25.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on INS. and JUD.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB334 Durazo et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
September 8, 2021: SB 334 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Reyes
- Yeas: 61
- Nays: 14
- Present/NV: 5
July 13, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
June 24, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 24, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB334 Durazo et al.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 20, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Nays: 2
March 25, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsors (8)
Type:
Primary Sponsor