+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (33)
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 600, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2352.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2603.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (July 7). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES.
On June 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and NAT. RES.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1392.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1188.) (May 20).
On May 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 17 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On May 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 17.
On May 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1019.) (May 4).
On April 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 4.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (7)
+ − Votes (8)
September 2, 2021: Unfinished Business SB332 Dodd et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
September 1, 2021: SB 332 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Wood
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
July 7, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
June 22, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Natural Resources]
- Yeas: 11
June 2, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB332 Dodd et al.
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 17, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
May 4, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor