+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (40)
On October 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 572, Statutes of 2021.
On September 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 31. Noes 6. Page 2521.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 2472.)
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on ED. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2315.) Re-referred to Com. on ED.
- Set for hearing September 7.
On September 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 11. Page 2602.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 26).
On August 24, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 2.) (August 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 61(a) suspended. (Ayes 54. Noes 16. Page 2468.)
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On June 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 31. Noes 5. Page 1414.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to second reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 5 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On March 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 668.) (March 10).
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On February 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 10.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 11.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (8)
September 8, 2021: Unfinished Business SB330 Durazo Concurrence
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 6
- Present/NV: 3
September 7, 2021: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 3
September 1, 2021: SB 330 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Santiago
- Yeas: 63
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 5
August 24, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 2
June 3, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB330 Durazo
- Yeas: 31
- Nays: 5
- Present/NV: 4
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 5, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 10, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor