+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 281, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On August 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2352.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On August 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 2768.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (July 19).
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on V.A. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 28).
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. GOV. and V.A.
On May 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1066.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 830.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 18, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on V.A. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (March 28). Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 28.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and V.A.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
August 31, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # SB330
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
August 24, 2017: SB 330 Berryhill, T. Consent Calendar Second Day Regular Session
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 3
July 19, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
- Present/NV: 1
July 11, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
June 28, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs]
- Yeas: 9
May 15, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB330 Berryhill
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
April 25, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
March 28, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Veterans Affairs] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor