+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 868, Statutes of 2019.
On September 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On September 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 44. Noes 20. Page 3580.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 3.) (August 30).
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 14 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 11, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) (July 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- (Received at desk July 10 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10)).
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 22, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 9. Page 1188.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1096.) (May 16).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 13 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 796.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 10 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 25, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 14, 2019: SB 328 Portantino Senate Third Reading By Gloria
- Yeas: 44
- Nays: 20
- Present/NV: 15
July 10, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
May 21, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB328 Portantino et al.
- Yeas: 24
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 5
May 16, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
May 13, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 24, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1