+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 279, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:15 p.m.
On August 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- (Corrected August 28.)
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2710.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (August 13).
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1174.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 1011.) (May 23).
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 756.) (April 30).
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 591.) (April 17).
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 17.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and PUB. S.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
August 26, 2013: SB 326 Beall Senate Third Reading By FONG
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
August 13, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
June 26, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Public Safety.
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB326 Beall
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 17, 2013: Do pass as amended, and re-refer to the Committee on Public Safety.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor