+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 764, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 13, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3:30 p.m.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2521.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 62. Noes 0. Page 2815.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 19).
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (July 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 6, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1034.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 457.) (March 10). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- Set for hearing March 10.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read first time.
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 8, 2021: Unfinished Business SB326 Pan et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 7, 2021: SB 326 Pan Senate Third Reading By Wood
- Yeas: 62
- Present/NV: 18
August 19, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
July 13, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 6, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB326 Pan et al.
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 10, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor