+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On July 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- July 9 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on B. & P. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 25). Re-referred to Com. on B. & P.
On June 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1267.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1096.) (May 16).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 715.) (April 10).
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 25, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Business and Professions] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
May 23, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB325 Hill
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
April 29, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 10, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor