+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 540, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2886.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3267.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 6, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 21, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (June 20). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1355.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1182.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 807.) (April 19).
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 14, 2017: Unfinished Business SB323 Mitchell Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 13, 2017: SB 323 Mitchell Senate Third Reading By WOOD
- Yeas: 78
- Present/NV: 1
September 1, 2017: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 6
June 20, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 15
May 31, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # SB323
- Yeas: 40
May 25, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor