+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 27, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 332, Statutes of 2021.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 9. Page 2547.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 63. Noes 0. Page 2885.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 2559.)
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- August 19 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (July 6).
On June 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (June 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on L. & E. and JUD.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 10. Page 1311.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 20).
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- May 3 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 21, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 3.
On April 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 2. Page 775.) (April 13).
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 13.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 1. Page 574.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on L., P.E. & R. and JUD.
On February 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 10.
- Read first time.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (10)
September 9, 2021: Unfinished Business SB321 Durazo et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 2
September 8, 2021: SB 321 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Chiu
- Yeas: 63
- Present/NV: 17
August 30, 2021: SB 321 Durazo Senate Third Reading Amend By CHIU Set #1
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 6
July 6, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
June 22, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB321 Durazo et al.
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 10
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 3, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 13, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
March 22, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 1
+ − Sponsors (10)
Type:
Primary Sponsor