+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (19)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1274.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1096.) (May 16).
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 6 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 796.) (April 24). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 24.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 621.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 1, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on HUMAN S. and ED.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
May 23, 2019: Special Consent SB321
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass
- Yeas: 6
May 6, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 1
April 24, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
April 8, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Education]
- Yeas: 6