+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (36)
On October 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 685, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1:30 p.m.
On September 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 2610.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3015.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Chau.
- Ordered to third reading.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 19).
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 7, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 6).
On June 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 29). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On June 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 10, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On June 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1344.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1187.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 590.) (March 23).
On March 12, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 23.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 424.) (March 9). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 9.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on PUB. S. and JUD.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (8)
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2021: Unfinished Business SB320 Eggman et al. By Rubio Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 3
September 9, 2021: SB 320 Eggman Senate Third Reading By Blanca Rubio
- Yeas: 79
- Present/NV: 1
August 19, 2021: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 16
July 6, 2021: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
June 29, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary] with recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
June 1, 2021: Special Consent SB320
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 20, 2021: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 23, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 11
March 9, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 4
+ − Sponsors (13)
Type:
Primary Sponsor