+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (7)
On February 3, 2020 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
April 30, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 3
April 30, 2019: [First] hearing set for [05-01-2019]: Failed passage in Committee. Reconsideration granted
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor