+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (14)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 25 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 1 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
On April 20, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 782.) (April 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 17, 2017 in the Senate:
- March 22 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 1, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 19, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor