+ − Summaries (8)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (28)
On September 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 367, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On September 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2785.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 79. Noes 0. Page 3181.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 3, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 21, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 21 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 14, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 14 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On June 6, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1265.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 17, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1096.) (May 16).
On May 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 16.
On April 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- April 29 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 549.) (April 3). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on EQ.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2019: Unfinished Business SB317 Caballero et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 40
September 9, 2019: SB 317 Caballero Senate Third Reading By Grayson
- Yeas: 79
June 18, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
May 23, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB317 Caballero et al.
- Yeas: 38
May 16, 2019: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 6
April 29, 2019: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 6
April 3, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7