+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2014 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1164.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1011.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 786.) (May 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 1.
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 10.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on ED.
On February 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
June 26, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB316 Block
- Yeas: 39
May 23, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
May 13, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 1, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor