+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (16)
On June 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 21, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2:30 p.m.
On June 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On June 10, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2234.) Ordered to the Senate.
On June 5, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 4).
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 4, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 4, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 563.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On March 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 438.) (March 26).
On March 12, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 26.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 10, 2019: SB 314 Dodd Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 75
- Present/NV: 5
June 4, 2019: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 11
- Present/NV: 1
April 4, 2019: Consent Calendar SB314
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
March 26, 2019: Do pass and be ordered to the Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 8
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor