+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (7)
On February 1, 2022 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 17, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 7.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor