+ − Summaries (3)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 726.) (April 21).
On April 15, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 14 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 11, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor