+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (37)
On October 11, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 679, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
On September 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 33. Noes 7. Page 2840.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 54. Noes 23. Page 3215.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 53. Noes 19. Page 3214.)
On September 11, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Bocanegra.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 53. Noes 21. Page 3173.)
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On July 20, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (July 19).
On June 27, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (June 27). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 8. Page 1343.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 2 p.m.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1181.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 8 hearing postponed by committee.
On May 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 8.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1. Page 855.) (April 25). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- Set for hearing April 25.
On April 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 4 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 4.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 13, 2017: Unfinished Business SB312 Skinner et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 7
September 12, 2017: SB 312 Skinner Motion to Reconsider By BOCANEGRA
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 19
- Present/NV: 7
September 11, 2017: SB 312 Skinner Senate Third Reading By BOCANEGRA
- Yeas: 53
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 5
June 27, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB312 Skinner
- Yeas: 32
- Nays: 8
May 25, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1