+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (31)
On October 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 826, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 3000.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 2. Page 3479.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (September 1).
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- June 28 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 13, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) (June 13). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 4, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 581.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published March 28 at 4 a.m.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 348.) (March 13).
On March 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 13.
On March 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- March 6 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 6.
On February 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 130.) (January 31). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On January 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 31.
On January 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 15, 2017: SB 31 Lara Third Reading Urgency By CHIU
- Yeas: 76
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
September 15, 2017: Unfinished Business SB31 Lara et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
June 13, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
April 3, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB31 Lara et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 13, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
January 31, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (15)
Type:
Primary Sponsor