+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (39)
On August 25, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 31. Noes 32. Page 6308.)
On August 19, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
- Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 48. Noes 22. Page 5979.)
On June 13, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Mark Stone.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 33. Noes 24. Page 5332.)
On June 6, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Ayes 40. Noes 24. Page 5277.)
On June 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From inactive file.
On May 31, 2016 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Calderon.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
- Reconsideration granted.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Bloom.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 21. Noes 35. Page 3033.)
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 26).
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 19 hearing postponed by committee.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 30).
On June 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 1062.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 819.) (April 28).
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 28.
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 14 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 14.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
August 19, 2016: SB 308 Wieckowski Motion to Reconsider By STONE
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 22
- Present/NV: 10
June 13, 2016: SB 308 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By STONE
- Yeas: 33
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 23
June 6, 2016: SB 308 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading Amend By STONE Set #1
- Yeas: 40
- Nays: 24
- Present/NV: 16
September 9, 2015: SB 308 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By BLOOM
- Yeas: 21
- Nays: 35
- Present/NV: 24
August 26, 2015: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
June 30, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 3
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB308 Wieckowski
- Yeas: 23
- Nays: 13
- Present/NV: 3
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
April 28, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor