+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (22)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On September 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- September 1 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On July 19, 2017 in the Assembly:
- July 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (July 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HIGHER ED.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 1355.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On May 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 2, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 847.) (April 26).
On April 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 26.
On April 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on ED.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 11, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
May 31, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # SB307
- Yeas: 40
May 25, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 26, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7