+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (28)
On October 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 540, Statutes of 2021.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 1 p.m.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 2385.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 2, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2700.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (August 26).
On July 14, 2021 in the Assembly:
- July 14 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On July 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 22, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (June 21). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On April 29, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 968.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 29, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 5.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- March 22 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 480.) (March 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 11.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (6)
September 3, 2021: Unfinished Business SB303 Borgeas et al. Concurrence
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
September 2, 2021: SB 303 Borgeas Senate Third Reading By Bigelow
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 2
August 26, 2021: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 16
June 21, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 29, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB303 Borgeas et al.
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 11, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor