+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (17)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- August 30 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On June 19, 2019 in the Assembly:
- June 19 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On June 12, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (June 11). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 24, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On May 9, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1007.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 9, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 385.) (March 20).
On March 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 20.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
June 11, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 14
- Present/NV: 1
May 9, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB301 Leyva
- Yeas: 38
March 20, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 8
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor