+ − Summary
+ − Full Text
+ − Actions (6)
On February 1, 2018 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On April 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 19 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor