+ − Summaries (4)
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (23)
On July 1, 2020 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 26, Statutes of 2020.
- Approved by the Governor.
On June 29, 2020 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4 p.m.
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 8. Page 3895.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On June 26, 2020 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 16. Page 4972.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 63 and 96 suspended. (Ayes 58. Noes 16. Page 4952.)
On June 23, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 30, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 13, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1029.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 7, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 771.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 15, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
June 29, 2020: Unfinished Business SB300 Umberg Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 3
June 26, 2020: SB 300 Umberg Senate Third Reading By BERMAN
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 16
- Present/NV: 6
May 13, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB300 Umberg
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 1
April 23, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor