+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (5)
+ − Actions (32)
On November 30, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Died on the inactive file.
- From Assembly without further action.
On August 29, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Kalra.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 4.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 1, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2.) (June 1). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 12, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On July 15, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On July 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 8. Page 1980.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On July 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 7, 2021 in the Senate:
- From inactive file.
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Senator Cortese.
On May 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1187.) (May 20).
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On May 14, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- April 19 hearing: Placed on APPR suspense file.
On April 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 689.) (April 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 18, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 6.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (6)
August 11, 2022: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 4
June 1, 2022: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
July 15, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB300 Cortese et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 5
May 20, 2021: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 19, 2021: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 6, 2021: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (9)
Type:
Primary Sponsor