+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (32)
On September 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 365, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5:30 p.m.
On September 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 2958.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 14, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 56. Noes 21. Page 3416.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Coauthors revised.
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Withdrawn from committee.
- Assembly Rule 96 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 23. Page 2826.)
- Coauthors revised.
On August 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On July 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on RLS. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (July 12). Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on H. & C.D.
On June 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 9. Page 1398.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 1175.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On April 3, 2017 in the Senate:
- April 3 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On March 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 3.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 444.) (March 22). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 1, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on GOV. & F. (Ayes 10. Noes 2. Page 288.) (February 28). Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing February 28.
On January 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on T. & H. and GOV. & F.
On December 6, 2016 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 5.
On December 5, 2016 in the Senate:
- (Corrected December 6).
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 15, 2017: Unfinished Business SB3 Beall et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 8
- Present/NV: 2
September 14, 2017: SB 3 Beall Third Reading Urgency By GLORIA
- Yeas: 56
- Nays: 21
- Present/NV: 2
July 12, 2017: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Rules]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB3 Beall et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 30
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2017: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 3, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
March 22, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
February 28, 2017: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Governance and Finance]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (22)
Type:
Primary Sponsor