+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (34)
On September 30, 2022 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 980, Statutes of 2022.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 26, 2022 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 22, 2022 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 4934.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 18, 2022 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 18, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 5943.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 16, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On August 11, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) (August 11).
On August 3, 2022 in the Assembly:
- August 3 set for first hearing. Placed on suspense file.
On June 28, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 20. Noes 0.) (June 22).
On June 8, 2022 in the Assembly:
- June 8 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 6, 2022 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On May 27, 2022 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 17, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On April 26, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 913.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 5, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Ordered to second reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On March 23, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On March 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On March 16, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 22.
On March 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 9, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 420.) (March 9).
On February 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 9.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on G.O.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (5)
+ − Votes (7)
August 22, 2022: Unfinished Business SB298 Dodd Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 18, 2022: SB 298 Dodd Senate Third Reading By Aguiar-Curry
- Yeas: 76
- Present/NV: 4
August 11, 2022: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 12
- Present/NV: 4
June 22, 2022: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 20
- Present/NV: 2
May 27, 2022: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 4
April 26, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB298 Dodd
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 2
March 9, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor