+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (30)
On October 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 626, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 5 p.m.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2368.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 3145.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 6, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2945.)
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 30).
On August 21, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On August 15, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (August 14). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 24, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 1173.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1010.) (May 23).
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
On May 7, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 756.) (April 30).
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on PUB. S.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 11, 2013: Unfinished Business SB298 Wyland Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
September 10, 2013: SB 298 Wyland Senate Third Reading By HARKEY
- Yeas: 77
- Present/NV: 1
August 30, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 16
- Nays: 1
August 14, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 9
May 29, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB298 Wyland
- Yeas: 37
- Present/NV: 2
May 20, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2013: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (3)
Type:
Primary Sponsor