+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (32)
On November 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- Died on unfinished business, reconsideration pending.
On August 30, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Weber.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 27. Noes 31. Page 7062.)
On August 24, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 16, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 15, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (August 15).
On August 6, 2018 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 25, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
On June 21, 2018 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
- Reconsideration granted.
On September 16, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Weber.
- Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 28. Noes 29. Page 3563.)
On September 8, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 29, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 3.) (June 27).
On June 15, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 1142.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 9 at 9 p.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 8, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 945.) (May 2).
On April 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 2.
On March 29, 2017 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 14, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (4)
August 15, 2018: Do pass.
- Yeas: 12
- Nays: 5
September 16, 2017: SB 298 Wieckowski Senate Third Reading By WEBER
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 29
- Present/NV: 22
May 22, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB298 Wieckowski
- Yeas: 22
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 6
May 2, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor