+ − Summary
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 8, 2021 in the Senate:
- Approved by the Governor.
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 726, Statutes of 2021.
On September 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 2 p.m.
On August 30, 2021 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2212.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On August 26, 2021 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 23, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 0. Page 2473.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 19, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read third time and amended.
- Ordered to third reading.
On July 1, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 30, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0.) (June 30).
On June 8, 2021 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 13, 2021 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 3, 2021 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1006.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 20, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 19, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 6, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 19.
On March 25, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 24, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 590.) (March 23).
On March 15, 2021 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
- Set for hearing March 23.
On March 11, 2021 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 14. Noes 0. Page 405.) (March 8).
On March 2, 2021 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 8.
On February 22, 2021 in the Senate:
- Art. IV. Sec. 8(a) of the Constitution dispensed with.
- (Ayes 32. Noes 4.)
- Joint Rule 55 suspended. (Ayes 32. Noes 4. Page 272.)
On February 10, 2021 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on B., P. & E.D. and JUD.
On February 4, 2021 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 6.
On February 3, 2021 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Analyses (6)
+ − Votes (7)
August 30, 2021: Unfinished Business SB297 Durazo Concurrence
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
August 23, 2021: SB 297 Durazo Senate Third Reading By Levine
- Yeas: 65
- Present/NV: 14
June 30, 2021: Do pass.
- Yeas: 13
- Present/NV: 3
June 8, 2021: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 2
May 3, 2021: Senate 3rd Reading SB297 Durazo
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 4
March 23, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
March 8, 2021: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 14
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor