+ − Full Texts (2)
+ − Actions (13)
On February 3, 2014 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- Held in committee and under submission.
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 26, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 488.) (April 9). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on V.A.
On March 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on V.A.
On February 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 21.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (2)
May 6, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 9, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor