+ − Summaries (10)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (40)
On October 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 607, Statutes of 2015.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 9. Page 2683.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 2488.)
- Set for hearing September 3.
On September 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on G.O. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d). (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 2390.) Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10(d).
On September 1, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 1. Page 2724.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On August 31, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 28, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 1.) (August 27).
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10))
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 15).
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (July 14). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On July 13, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended. (Page 2348.)
- Assembly Rule 56 suspended. (Page 2348.)
On July 6, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Coms. on E.S. & T.M. and G.O. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On July 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Be re-referred to Coms. on G.O. and E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (July 2). Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On June 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Assembly Rule 96.
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
- June 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On June 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1074.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1033.) (May 18).
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 919.) (May 6). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 29 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
- Set for hearing April 29.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (13)
September 10, 2015: Unfinished Business SB295 Jackson Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 9
- Present/NV: 4
September 3, 2015: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
September 1, 2015: SB 295 Jackson Senate Third Reading By WILLIAMS
- Yeas: 73
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 6
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 3
July 15, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 3
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
July 14, 2015: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 6
- Nays: 1
July 2, 2015: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
July 2, 2015: Be re-referred to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 10
- Present/NV: 1
May 22, 2015: Special Consent #2 SB295 De León
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 18, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 6, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
May 6, 2015: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations] with the recommendation: To Consent Calendar
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor