+ − Summaries (6)
+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (26)
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On October 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 17, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 4:45 p.m.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 27. Noes 12. Page 2777.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 11, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 25. Page 3182.) Ordered to the Senate.
- Assembly Rule 78 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 3182.)
- Assembly Rule 63 suspended. (Ayes 51. Noes 28. Page 3182.)
- From inactive file.
On September 10, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Notice of intention to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Holden.
On July 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to inactive file on request of Assembly Member Holden.
On June 29, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 25, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 24).
On May 22, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E., R., & S.S.
On May 5, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 25. Noes 10. Page 881.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 797.) (April 27).
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 27.
On April 22, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On April 21, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 11, 2015: SB 292 Pan Senate Third Reading By BONTA
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 25
- Present/NV: 7
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 4) SB292 Pan Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
September 11, 2015: Unfinished Business (Supplemental File 4) SB292 Pan Concurrence
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 12
- Present/NV: 1
June 24, 2015: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 4, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB292 Pan
- Yeas: 25
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 4
April 27, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor