+ − Full Texts (4)
+ − Actions (19)
On August 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 88, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On August 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10 a.m.
On July 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2292.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 1, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On June 27, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (June 26).
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on L. & E.
On June 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Hearing postponed by committee.
On May 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Coms. on JUD. and L. & E.
On April 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 607.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 567.) (April 16).
On April 5, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 16.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
July 3, 2013: SB 292 Corbett Consent Calendar Second Day
- Yeas: 74
- Present/NV: 4
June 26, 2013: Do pass, to Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 7
June 18, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Labor and Employment.
- Yeas: 9
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB292 Corbett
- Yeas: 38
April 16, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 7
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor