+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (32)
On April 25, 2016 in the Senate:
- Last day to consider Governors veto pursuant to Joint Rule 58.5.
On October 7, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Consideration of Governor's veto pending.
- Vetoed by the Governor.
On September 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 10:45 p.m.
On September 10, 2015 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 37. Noes 1. Page 2674.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 80. Noes 0. Page 3029.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 24, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Cristina Garcia.
On August 20, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 19, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 19).
On July 16, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) (July 14).
On June 30, 2015 in the Assembly:
- June 30 hearing postponed by committee.
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On June 2, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 1190.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1151.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 11, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 11 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 11.
On April 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 758.) (April 22).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 9, 2015 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (10)
September 10, 2015: Unfinished Business SB291 Lara Concurrence
- Yeas: 37
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 2
September 9, 2015: SB 291 Lara Senate Third Reading By O'DONNELL
- Yeas: 80
August 19, 2015: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 17
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
July 14, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 18
- Present/NV: 1
June 1, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB291 Lara
- Yeas: 36
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
May 28, 2015: Do pass
- Yeas: 7
May 11, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 22, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
April 22, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Present/NV: 2
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor