+ − Summaries (2)
+ − Full Texts (3)
+ − Actions (12)
On February 1, 2016 in the Senate:
- Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
On May 28, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 28 hearing: Held in committee and under submission.
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 18, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 18 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 8, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 18.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 860.) (April 29).
On April 6, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On April 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 29.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HEALTH.
On February 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 26.
On February 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (3)
May 18, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 29, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
April 29, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 3
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor