+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (28)
On November 30, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On August 11, 2016 in the Assembly:
- August 11 hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
On March 1, 2016 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 27, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 27 hearing postponed by committee.
- Joint Rule 62(a) suspended.
On August 26, 2015 in the Assembly:
- August 26 set for first hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On August 18, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On August 17, 2015 in the Assembly:
- (Received at desk July 17 pursuant to JR 61(a)(10))
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1.) (July 13).
On June 15, 2015 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on U. & C.
On June 4, 2015 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On June 3, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 1301.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On June 2, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On June 1, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 1151.) (May 28).
On May 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 28.
On May 4, 2015 in the Senate:
- May 4 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 29, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
- Set for hearing May 4.
On April 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 23, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 724.) (April 21).
On April 14, 2015 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On March 27, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 21.
On March 26, 2015 in the Senate:
- April 7 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On March 24, 2015 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 7.
On March 5, 2015 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
On February 20, 2015 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 22.
On February 19, 2015 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
July 13, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
July 13, 2015: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 4
June 3, 2015: Senate 3rd Reading SB286 Hertzberg
- Yeas: 34
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 4
May 28, 2015: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1
May 4, 2015: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
April 21, 2015: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 11
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor