+ − Summaries (5)
+ − Full Texts (9)
+ − Actions (30)
On November 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From Assembly without further action.
- From committee without further action.
On July 30, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On July 29, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On July 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On June 18, 2020 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
- Referred to Com. on L. GOV.
On January 27, 2020 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On January 27, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 11. Page 3151.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On January 22, 2020 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On January 21, 2020 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 3120.) (January 21).
On January 14, 2020 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing January 21.
On January 6, 2020 in the Senate:
- (Corrected January 6).
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- May 6 set for first hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 26, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 6.
On April 24, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 802.) (April 23). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23 in PUB. S. pending receipt.
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on PUB. S. (Ayes 10. Noes 4. Page 619.) (April 9).
On March 29, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 9.
On March 28, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
On March 27, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on G.O. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 465.) (March 27).
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on GOV. & F.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 27.
On March 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- March 20 hearing postponed by committee.
On March 6, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 20.
On February 21, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on GOV. & F., G.O., and PUB. S.
On February 14, 2019 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 16.
On February 13, 2019 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (5)
January 27, 2020: Senate 3rd Reading SB281 Wiener et al.
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 1
January 21, 2020: Do pass
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
April 23, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 9, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Public Safety]
- Yeas: 10
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 2
March 27, 2019: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Governmental Organization]
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsors (14)
Type:
Primary Sponsor