+ − Summaries (9)
+ − Full Texts (8)
+ − Actions (33)
On September 30, 2017 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 388, Statutes of 2017.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2017 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 7, 2017 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2583.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 6, 2017 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On September 5, 2017 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 5, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 1. Page 2968.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 31, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended.
On August 28, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- From consent calendar on motion of Assembly Member Calderon.
On August 24, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to consent calendar.
On August 23, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. Ordered to consent calendar. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (August 23).
On July 18, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On July 17, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (July 11).
On July 3, 2017 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On June 12, 2017 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on HUM. S.
On June 1, 2017 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 31, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1317.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- Published May 26 at 10 a.m.
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to third reading.
On May 25, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 1181.) (May 25).
On May 19, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 25.
On May 15, 2017 in the Senate:
- May 15 hearing: Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On May 4, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 15.
On April 27, 2017 in the Senate:
- Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 26, 2017 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass as amended and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 849.) (April 25).
On March 22, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 25.
On March 21, 2017 in the Senate:
- March 28 hearing postponed by committee.
On February 28, 2017 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 28.
On February 23, 2017 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on HUMAN S.
On February 10, 2017 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 12.
On February 9, 2017 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (8)
September 7, 2017: Special Consent Calendar # SB278
- Yeas: 40
September 5, 2017: SB 278 Wiener Senate Third Reading By STONE
- Yeas: 75
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 3
August 23, 2017: Do pass. To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 15
- Present/NV: 2
July 11, 2017: Do pass as amended and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
May 31, 2017: Senate 3rd Reading SB278 Wiener
- Yeas: 39
- Present/NV: 1
May 25, 2017: Do pass as amended
- Yeas: 7
May 15, 2017: Placed on suspense file
- Yeas: 7
April 25, 2017: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 4
- Present/NV: 1
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor