+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (27)
On October 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 755, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 7 p.m.
On September 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2285.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 9, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 3001.) Ordered to the Senate.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On August 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (August 30).
On August 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
On June 26, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (June 26). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On June 14, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
On May 30, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 29, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1190.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Ordered to special consent calendar.
On May 24, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 23, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 1010.) (May 23).
On May 17, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 23.
On May 13, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 22, 2013 in the Senate:
- Placed on APPR. suspense file.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 9, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To consent calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 467.) (April 8). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 2, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 8.
On March 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on P.E. & R.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
September 10, 2013: Unfinished Business SB277 Beall Concurrence
- Yeas: 36
- Present/NV: 3
September 9, 2013: SB 277 Beall Senate Third Reading By BONTA
- Yeas: 78
June 26, 2013: Do pass and re-refer to Committee on Appropriations with recommendation: To Consent Calendar.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
May 29, 2013: Special Consent #7 SB277 Beall
- Yeas: 38
- Present/NV: 1
May 23, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 6
- Present/NV: 1
April 22, 2013: Placed on Appropriations Suspense file.
- Yeas: 7
April 8, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations Recommend Consent.
- Yeas: 5
+ − Sponsor
Type:
Primary Sponsor