+ − Full Texts (6)
+ − Actions (29)
On October 4, 2013 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 564, Statutes of 2013.
- Approved by the Governor.
On September 11, 2013 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On September 6, 2013 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 26. Noes 11. Page 2181.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On September 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On September 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 48. Noes 27. Page 2828.) Ordered to the Senate.
On August 22, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Ordered to third reading.
- Read third time and amended. (Page 2669.)
On August 5, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On July 3, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (July 3).
On June 18, 2013 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 2.) (June 18). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On June 10, 2013 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on JUD.
On May 29, 2013 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On May 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 28. Noes 11. Page 1092.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 21, 2013 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On May 20, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 989.) (May 20).
On May 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 10, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 20.
On May 8, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On May 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing May 13.
On May 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 753.) (April 30). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 19, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 30.
On April 18, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
On April 12, 2013 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 23.
On April 3, 2013 in the Senate:
- Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On April 1, 2013 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 28, 2013 in the Senate:
- Referred to Com. on RLS.
On February 15, 2013 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after March 17.
On February 14, 2013 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (6)
September 6, 2013: Unfinished Business SB274 Leno Concurrence
- Yeas: 26
- Nays: 11
- Present/NV: 2
September 3, 2013: SB 274 Leno Senate Third Reading By STONE
- Yeas: 48
- Nays: 27
- Present/NV: 3
June 18, 2013: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
May 28, 2013: Senate 3rd Reading SB274 Leno
- Yeas: 28
- Nays: 11
May 20, 2013: Do pass.
- Yeas: 4
- Nays: 2
- Present/NV: 1
April 30, 2013: Do pass, but re-refer to the Committee on Appropriations.
- Yeas: 5
- Nays: 2
+ − Sponsors (2)
Type:
Primary Sponsor