+ − Summaries (7)
+ − Full Texts (7)
+ − Actions (26)
On July 30, 2019 in the Senate:
- Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 121, Statutes of 2019.
- Approved by the Governor.
On July 18, 2019 in the Senate:
- Enrolled and presented to the Governor at 3 p.m.
On July 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- Assembly amendments concurred in. (Ayes 29. Noes 10. Page 2044.) Ordered to engrossing and enrolling.
On July 8, 2019 in the Senate:
- In Senate. Concurrence in Assembly amendments pending.
On July 8, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 17. Page 2573.) Ordered to the Senate.
On July 1, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On June 27, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Read second time and amended. Ordered to second reading.
On June 26, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 4.) (June 26).
On June 20, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (June 19). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On May 29, 2019 in the Assembly:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 16, 2019 in the Assembly:
- Referred to Com. on E. & R.
On May 2, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 27. Noes 10. Page 918.) Ordered to the Assembly.
On May 2, 2019 in the Assembly:
- In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
On April 23, 2019 in the Senate:
- Read second time. Ordered to third reading.
On April 22, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Be ordered to second reading pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
On April 10, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On April 5, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 22.
On April 3, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1. Page 552.) (April 2). Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
On March 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing April 2.
On March 19, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee: Do pass and re-refer to Com. on JUD. (Ayes 3. Noes 1. Page 367.) (March 19). Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
On March 11, 2019 in the Senate:
- From committee with author's amendments. Read second time and amended. Re-referred to Com. on E. & C.A.
On February 20, 2019 in the Senate:
- Set for hearing March 19.
On January 16, 2019 in the Senate:
- Referred to Coms. on E. & C.A. and JUD.
On December 4, 2018 in the Senate:
- From printer. May be acted upon on or after January 3.
On December 3, 2018 in the Senate:
- Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
+ − Votes (7)
July 11, 2019: Unfinished Business SB27 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause Concurrence
- Yeas: 29
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
July 8, 2019: SB 27 McGuire Third Reading Urgency By SANTIAGO
- Yeas: 57
- Nays: 17
- Present/NV: 5
June 26, 2019: Do pass as amended.
- Yeas: 11
- Nays: 4
- Present/NV: 3
June 19, 2019: Do pass and be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 5
- Present/NV: 2
May 2, 2019: Senate 3rd Reading SB27 McGuire et al. Urgency Clause
- Yeas: 27
- Nays: 10
- Present/NV: 1
April 2, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Appropriations]
- Yeas: 7
- Nays: 1
March 19, 2019: Do pass, but first be re-referred to the Committee on [Judiciary]
- Yeas: 3
- Nays: 1
- Present/NV: 1